Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Allergan plc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Physician Total Care Inc, Perry Fine, Purdue Pharma Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Lynn Webster, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00880
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Docket Annotation: DETAILS: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45988, filed 11/12/2019. (kmt)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Lifting Stay of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt)
November 5, 2019 Docket Annotation: Case has been sent to the Northern District of Ohio. (kmt)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/30/19. (kmt)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/30/19. (kmt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, (to file Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Sharpe, G)
October 29, 2019 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Order)(Quinn, Ashley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Quinn, Ashley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Expedite by Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P., #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd)
October 23, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Remand by Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc.; EndoPharmaceuticals Inc.; Purdue Pharma L.P.; Purdue Pharma Inc.; The Purdue Frederick Company; Cephalon, Inc.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a WatsonPharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis Pharma, Inc; Watson Pharma, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Mallinckrodt LLC; Mallinckrodt plc.; and Insys Therapeutics, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition within 45 days after the later of: 1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditionaltransfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action to state court. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/11/2019. (mb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 29 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 3, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Mallinckrodt LLC . (Epstein, Jon)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Moving defendants shall answer orotherwise respond to Plaintiffs pleading not later than 60 days following the latter of either 1) a decision by the JPML finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/3/2019. (mb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 25 ENTER ORDER striking #3 Disclosure Statement for failure to comply with LCvR7.11. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/2/19. (kmt)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #5 Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Motion toCorrect Caption to Reflect Substitution of Party. All future captions shall reflect this change. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/2/19. (kmt)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #14 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition UnderRule 12. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/2/19. (kmt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 30, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUIREMENTS TO GIVE NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Epstein, Jon)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by Mallinckrodt LLC (Epstein, Jon)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Appearance-Quest, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Granting Motion-Quest, #5 Exhibit 5 - Appearance-ABDC, #6 Exhibit 6 - Appearance-Cardinal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Appearance-Harvard, #8 Exhibit 8 - Appearance-McKesson, #9 Exhibit 9 - Motion for Extension-McKesson, #10 Exhibit 10 - Order Granting Motion-McKesson, #11 Exhibit 11 - Order Granting Motion-CVS, #12 Exhibit 12 - Motion for Extension-CVS, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order Granting Extension-MFs, #14 Exhibit 14 - Appearance-Anda, #15 Exhibit 15 - Motion for Enlargement-Anda, #16 Exhibit 16 - Motion for Extension-MFs, #17 Exhibit 17 - Order Granting Motion-Anda, #18 Exhibit 18 - Appearance-Purdue, #19 Exhibit 19 - LCvR77.1)(Campbell, Stuart)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption to Reflect Substitution of Party by Amerisourcebergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 STRICKEN per #25 Enter Order filed 10/2/19 (kmt). DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Mallinckrodt LLC . (Epstein, Jon)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon Epstein on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC (Epstein, Jon)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Pottawatomi County, case number CJ-19-80 filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 8.27.19 Summons Petition (Board of County Commissioners, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2.22.19 Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - 9.5.19 Entry of Appearance of D. Todd Riddles, #4 Exhibit 4 - 9.5.19 Order Granting Motion for Enlargement, #5 Exhibit 5 - 9.9.19 Entry of Appearance of D. Michael McBride, #6 Exhibit 6 - 9.9.19 Entry of Appearance of Ryan A Ray, #7 Exhibit 7 - 9.9.19 Entry of Appearance of Ryan A. Ray, #8 Exhibit 8 - 9.9.19 Entry of Appearance of Stuart D. Campbell and Kaylee, #9 Exhibit 9 - 9.9.19 Unopposed Motion and Special Appearance of McKesson, #10 Exhibit 10 - 9.10.19 Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Subs, #11 Exhibit 11 - 9.13.19 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, #12 Exhibit 12 - 9.13.19 Order Granting Defendants Unopposed Motion, #13 Exhibit 13 - 9.16.19 Manufacturer Defendants' Unopposed Motion, #14 Exhibit 14 - 9.16.19 Order Granting Manufacturer Defendants' Motion, #15 Exhibit 15 - 9.16.19 Entry of Appearance of Jeffrey Curran and Ashley, #16 Exhibit 16 - 9.16.19 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer, #17 Exhibit 17 - 9.17.19 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement, #18 Exhibit 18 - 9.19.19 Entry of Appearance of Joshua D. Burns and Evan Way, #19 Exhibit 19 - State Court Docket Sheet, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)
September 23, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3002931. (Epstein, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Represented By: Amy J Pierce
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?