Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, SPECGX LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc, Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00926
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #21 Response to Motion filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC. (Epstein, Jon)
December 5, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC . (Epstein, Jon)
December 5, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon Epstein on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC (Epstein, Jon)
December 3, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #21 Response to Motion filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (McCampbell, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #21 Response to Motion by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Sill, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Sill, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation filed by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Sill, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 the Moving Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/13/2019. (ks)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's and Defendant PD-Rx Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Joint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/12/2019. (ks)
November 11, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Par Pharmaceutical Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 11, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions by Plaintiff Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County and by Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bragalone, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand Motion filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement by Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bragalone, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement by Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bragalone, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A Bragalone on behalf of Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc (Bragalone, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand Motion by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty v. Purdue, #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty v. Purdue, #3 Exhibit 3 - Remand Order_Town of Randolph v. Purdue, #4 Exhibit 4 - Opinion_Dinwiddle v. Purdue, #5 Exhibit 5 - Opinion_IL Public Risk v. Purdue)(Sill, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Trotter Remand Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams Remand Order)(Sill, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3012277. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-4562 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Okla County NoR (Service Packet), #2 Exhibit 02 State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 03 Petition, #4 Exhibit 04 Summons Returned - Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #5 Exhibit 05 Summons Returned - PD-RX Pharmaceuticals Inc, #6 Exhibit 06 Summons Returned - Watson Pharma Inc, #7 Exhibit 07 Summons Returned - Purdue Pharma LP, #8 Exhibit 08 Summons Returned - Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #9 Exhibit 09 Summons Returned - Watson Laboratories Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 Summons Returned - Actavis Pharma Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 Summons Returned - Mallinckrodt LLC, #12 Exhibit 12 Summons Returned - Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 Summons Returned - Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #14 Exhibit 14 Summons Returned - Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 Summons Returned - Actavis PLC, #16 Exhibit 16 Summons Returned - Johnson & Johnson, #17 Exhibit 17 Summons Returned - The Purdue Frederick Company, #18 Exhibit 18 Summons Returned - Actavis LLC, #19 Exhibit 19 Summons Returned - Cephalon Inc, #20 Exhibit 20 Summons Returned - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #21 Exhibit 21 Summons Returned - Allergan PLC, #22 Exhibit 22 Summons Returned - Purdue Pharma Inc, #23 Exhibit 23 Summons Returned - Par Pharmaceutical Inc, #24 Exhibit 24 Summons Returned - Endo Health Solutions Inc, #25 Exhibit 25 Summons Returned - Mallinckrodt PLC, #26 Exhibit 26 Summons Returned - Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, #27 Exhibit 27 Summons Returned - Specgx LLX, #28 Exhibit 28 Summons Returned - Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, #29 Exhibit 29 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Endo et al), #30 Exhibit 30 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Endo et al), #31 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Robert H Alexander, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County
Represented By: S Alex Yaffe
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?