Smith v. Oklahoma State of
Petitioner: Nicois Megale Smith
Respondent: Oklahoma State of
Case Number: 5:2019cv00928
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicois Megale Smith. (nv)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ~ IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner show cause no later than December 16, 2019, why this Court should not dismiss his Petition without prejudice. Petitioner's failure to respond to this Order could result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/25/2019. (dwl)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION of Discovery and Response to Order, by Nicois Megale Smith. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Nicois Megale Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ~ IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner show cause no later than December 3, 2019, why this Court should not dismiss his Petition without prejudice. Petitioner's failure to respond to this Order could result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/12/2019. (dwl)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicois Megale Smith. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(em)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY ~ Petitioner shall cure the deficiency designated above no later than November 29, 2019. Failure to comply with this second Order may likely result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/8/2019. (dwl)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY ~ Petitioner shall cure the deficiency designated above no later than October 30, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/9/2019. (dwl)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 10/8/19. (rb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to caseEntered at the direction of the Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/8/19. (rb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 PREVIOUS Cases (rb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nicois Megale Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicois Megale Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?