Johnson v. Core Civic Corporations
Plaintiff: Joshua Clifton Johnson
Defendant: Core Civic Corporations
Case Number: 5:2019cv00962
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Mail sent to Joshua Clifton Johnson (rb)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Please see Order for further details. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before December 30th, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 12/10/2019. (cps)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. Please see Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 12/10/2019. (cps)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Receipt for Money Received from Joshua Clifton Johnson in the amount of $43.01, receipt number OKW500077491 regarding #1 Complaint. Balance remaining is $306.99. Mailed receipt to Joshua Clifton Johnson #470898 LEXINGTON-LARC-260 14-D2-J P O Box 260 Lexington, OK 73051. (rb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Joshua Johnson (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Request for Disbursement, #2 Envelope) (rb)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is given additional time until December 2nd, 2019, to comply with the Courts Order entered on October 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/15/2019. (cps)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Joshua Clifton Johnson. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Docs re #1 Complaint #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 Previous Cases, along with Change of Address rules. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cps)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see Order for further details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff.Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/23/2019. (cps)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell.Entered at the direction of the Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/22/19. (rb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (rb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Clifton Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Core Civic Corporations filed by Joshua Clifton Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Core Civic Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Clifton Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Civic Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?