St. Clair v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Robert A St. Clair
Defendant: Ephriam Edwards and Hopeland Trucking LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00981
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry E Finn on behalf of Robert A St. Clair (Finn, Larry)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Hopeland Trucking LLC . (Newman, Rebecca)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hopeland Trucking LLC. (Folluo, Dan)
October 28, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3023837. (Newman, Rebecca)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of McClain County, case number CJ-2019-180 filed by Hopeland Trucking LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons to Hopeland, #3 Exhibit 3-Summons to Edwards, #4 Exhibit 4-Special EOA & Res of Time, #5 Exhibit 5-Hopeland Answer, #6 Exhibit 6-Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit 7-Notice of Removal-state court, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Clair v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ephriam Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeland Trucking LLC
Represented By: Rebecca L Newman
Represented By: Dan S Folluo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A St. Clair
Represented By: Forrest L P DeVaughn
Represented By: Larry E Finn
Represented By: Murry J Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?