MMC Contractors National Inc v. Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124
Plaintiff: MMC Contractors National Inc
Defendant: Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124
Case Number: 5:2019cv01005
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MMC Contractors National Inc (Rector, Jonathan)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124 answer due 12/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/27/2019. (jb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Otherwise Plead by Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124. (Frasier, Frank)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124 answer due 12/2/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/22/2019. (jb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124. (Frasier, Frank)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Frank W Frasier, III on behalf of Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124 (Frasier, Frank)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey M Place on behalf of MMC Contractors National Inc (Place, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Kurt B Rose on behalf of MMC Contractors National Inc (Rose, Kurt)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew P Lane on behalf of MMC Contractors National Inc (Lane, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by MMC Contractors National Inc . (Rector, Jonathan)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Rose shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before November 21, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/07/2019. (jb)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Lane shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before November 21, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/07/2019. (jb)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Place shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before November 21, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/07/2019. (jb)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/07/2019. (jb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MMC Contractors National Inc. Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124 served on 11/5/2019. (Rector, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kurt B. Rose Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3031366 by MMC Contractors National Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Kurt B. Rose)(Rector, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew P. Lane Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3031357 by MMC Contractors National Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Matthew Lane)(Rector, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey M. Place Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3031345 by MMC Contractors National Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rector, Jonathan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Order (for Relief of Local Counsel Requirement) by MMC Contractors National Inc. (Rector, Jonathan)
November 1, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3028158. (Rector, Jonathan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124. (ank)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124 filed by MMC Contractors National Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - May 9 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 23 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - June 28 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Decision, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MMC Contractors National Inc v. Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMC Contractors National Inc
Represented By: Jonathan G Rector
Represented By: Matthew P Lane
Represented By: Jeffrey M Place
Represented By: Kurt B Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheet Metal Air Rail and Transportation Workers International Association Local 124
Represented By: Frank W Frasier, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?