US Xpress Inc v. Wang et al
Plaintiff: US Xpress Inc
Defendant: Glory Christ Cross Transportation LLC and Youzhi Wang
Case Number: 5:2019cv01042
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time and extending the administrative closure in this matter to January 30, 2020. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 12/31/2019. (jb)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by All Defendants. (Murray, Todd)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 12/03/2019. (jb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by All Defendants. (Teague, J)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 11:40 AM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 1/2/2020. (jb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Glory Christ Cross Transportation LLC, Youzhi Wang.(Teague, J)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by US Xpress Inc. Amendment to #8 Entry of Appearance . (Barahona, Marcus)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Marcus A Barahona on behalf of US Xpress Inc (Barahona, Marcus)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by US Xpress Inc . (Wheeler, Peter)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter L Wheeler on behalf of US Xpress Inc (Wheeler, Peter)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Glory Christ Cross Transportation LLC . (Teague, J)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Teague, J)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Todd A Murray on behalf of Glory Christ Cross Transportation LLC, Youzhi Wang (Murray, Todd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derrick Teague on behalf of Glory Christ Cross Transportation LLC, Youzhi Wang (Teague, J)
November 13, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3035083. (Teague, J)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Custer County, case number CJ-2019-80 filed by Youzhi Wang, Glory Christ Cross Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket Details, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA, #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service GCCT (srvd 10.24.19), #5 Exhibit 5 - Return of Service Wang (srvd 10.25.19), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Xpress Inc v. Wang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glory Christ Cross Transportation LLC
Represented By: J Derrick Teague
Represented By: Todd A Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youzhi Wang
Represented By: J Derrick Teague
Represented By: Todd A Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Xpress Inc
Represented By: Peter L Wheeler
Represented By: Marcus A Barahona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?