Jordan Gomez v. Paulin et al
Plaintiff: Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez
Defendant: Tony Bryson, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr and Bruce Paulin
Case Number: 5:2019cv01059
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Copy of Complaint served on Timothy Downing, US Attorney Western District of Oklahoma on 11/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez. (Cary, Breanna)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez. William Barr served on 11/25/2019. (Cary, Breanna)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez. Kevin McAleenan served on 12/30/2019. (Cary, Breanna)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez. Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 11/25/2019. (Cary, Breanna)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez. Tony Bryson served on 11/20/2019. (Cary, Breanna)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez. Bruce Paulin served on 11/20/2019. (Cary, Breanna)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Honorable Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. By direction of Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/27/2019. (sr)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Breanna R Cary on behalf of Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez (Cary, Breanna)
November 18, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE 5:19-cv-01059-PRW Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3038303. (Cary, Breanna)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to William Barr, Tony Bryson, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Bruce Paulin. (kmt)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Barr, Tony Bryson, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Bruce Paulin filed by Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan Gomez v. Paulin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Paulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Ricardo Jordan Gomez
Represented By: Breanna R Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?