Baker v. Mulholland Energy Services LLC
Plaintiff: Corey Baker
Defendant: Mulholland Energy Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01086
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Mulholland Energy Services LLC.(Whatley, Nathan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Mulholland Energy Services LLC . (Whatley, Nathan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan L Whatley on behalf of Mulholland Energy Services LLC (Whatley, Nathan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Baker. Mulholland Energy Services LLC served on 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment C.Baker Certified Mail Return Receipt for Proof of Service Summons)(Mershon, Jillian)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jillian R Mershon on behalf of Corey Baker (Mershon, Jillian)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine R Mazaheri on behalf of Corey Baker (Mazaheri, Katherine)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for the parties to file their entries of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 11/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/22/2019. (lam)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine R Mazaheri on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mazaheri, Katherine)
November 22, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3041934. (Mazaheri, Katherine)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER; Counsel for the parties are directed to file their entries of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than November 27, 2019. Signed by the direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/22/19. (nv)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mulholland Energy Services LLC. (nv)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mulholland Energy Services LLC filed by Corey Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Mulholland Energy Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Baker
Represented By: Katherine R Mazaheri
Represented By: Jillian R Mershon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulholland Energy Services LLC
Represented By: Nathan L Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?