Trent et al v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Byren Trent
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Pfizer Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc and Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01094
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Docket Annotation: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-46141, filed 12/17/2019. (nv)
December 12, 2019 Docket Annotation: Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (nv)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDERtransferring case to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (nv)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Quinn, Ashley)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
November 25, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3042937. (Quinn, Ashley)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pottawatomie County District Court, case number CJ-2019-455 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dec. 5, 2017 Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trent et al v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byren Trent
Represented By: Katherine J Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?