Jackson County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Jackson County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Saj Distributors, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01108
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OH Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - OH Order on Mtn to Remand)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 41 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order granting Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - JPML 6437, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wis Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Cal Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - JPML 5737, #17 Exhibit 17 - JPML 6100, #18 Exhibit 18 - JPML 6538, #19 Exhibit 19 - Alameda Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Portland Order, #21 Exhibit 21 - EDVA Order, #22 Exhibit 22 - WDVA Order, #23 Exhibit 23 - Cal Stay Order, #24 Exhibit 24 - Ill Stay Order, #25 Exhibit 25 - Fla Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 10, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Expedite filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 , #36 and #37 unopposed motions (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 1/3/2020. (ks)
January 3, 2020 Filing 37 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 3, 2020 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Extension)(Evans, Kyle)
December 31, 2019 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Ashley E Quinn terminated. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/23/2019. (ks)
December 20, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Expedite by Jackson County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P., #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Remand by Jackson County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/11/2019. (ks)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Defendants McKesson Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc.; The Harvard Drug Group, LLC; AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation; and H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company's unopposed joint motion to extend time to answer, move or otherwise respond to complaint (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/4/2019. (ks)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Honorable Robin J. Cauthron no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 12/3/19. (wh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 12/3/19. (wh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Service Documents)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co (McBride, D)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co . (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
November 26, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3044392. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Jackson County, case number CJ-2019-00070 filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 002 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 003 - Summonses, #4 Exhibit 004 - Return of Service (Physicians Total Care), #5 Exhibit 005 - Return of Service (Endo Pharma), #6 Exhibit 006 - Return of Service (HD Smith), #7 Exhibit 007 - Return of Service (McKesson), #8 Exhibit 008 - Return of Service (OK CVS Pharm), #9 Exhibit 009 - Appearance (ABDC), #10 Exhibit 010 - Appearance (Quest), #11 Exhibit 011 - Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #12 Exhibit 012 - Return of Service (Actavis LLC), #13 Exhibit 013 - Return of Service (Actavis Pharma), #14 Exhibit 014 - Return of Service (Anda Inc), #15 Exhibit 015 - Return of Service (Anda Pharma Inc), #16 Exhibit 016 - Return of Service (Cardinal), #17 Exhibit 017 - Return of Service (Cephalon), #18 Exhibit 018 - Return of Service (CVS Pharma), #19 Exhibit 019 - Return of Service (HD Smith), #20 Exhibit 020 - Return of Service (J&J), #21 Exhibit 021 - Return of Service (Keysource), #22 Exhibit 022 - Return of Service (Mallinckrodt LLC), #23 Exhibit 023 - Return of Service (Mallinckrodt PLC), #24 Exhibit 024 - Return of Service (Morris & Dickson), #25 Exhibit 025 - Return of Service (Ortho McNeil), #26 Exhibit 026 - Return of Service (Physicians Total), #27 Exhibit 027 - Return of Service (Purdue Frederick), #28 Exhibit 028 - Return of Service (Quest), #29 Exhibit 029 - Return of Service (SAJ Dist), #30 Exhibit 030 - Return of Service (SAJ), #31 Exhibit 031 - Return of Service (Teva Pharma USA), #32 Exhibit 032 - Return of Service (Walgreens Boots), #33 Exhibit 033 - Return of Service (Watson Labs Inc), #34 Exhibit 034 - Appearance (McKesson), #35 Exhibit 035 - Order Granting Motion (CVS), #36 Exhibit 036 - Order Granting Motion (Quest), #37 Exhibit 037 - Motion for Enlargement (CVS), #38 Exhibit 038 - Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #39 Exhibit 039 - Order Granting Motion (HD Smith), #40 Exhibit 040 - Appearance (Cardinal), #41 Exhibit 041 - Appearance (Harvard), #42 Exhibit 042 - Appearance (HD Smith), #43 Exhibit 043 - Motion for Extension (HD Smith), #44 Exhibit 044 - Order Granting Motion (Endo), #45 Exhibit 045 - Order Granting Motion (McKesson), #46 Exhibit 046 - Motion for Extension (Endo), #47 Exhibit 047 - Motion for Extension (Endo), #48 Exhibit 048 - Appearance (Anda), #49 Exhibit 049 - Motion for Enlargement (Anda), #50 Exhibit 050 - Motion for Enlargement (Anda Pharm), #51 Exhibit 051 - Order Granting Motion (Anda), #52 Exhibit 052 - Order Granting Motion (McKesson), #53 Exhibit 053 - LCvR7.1, #54 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saj Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Patrick O'Hara, Jr
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?