Woodward County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Woodward County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Saj Distributors, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01110
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit Ohio MDL 2804 Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 44 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ada OK Stay Order, #2 Exhibit Seminole OK Stay Order, #3 Exhibit Osage OK Stay Order, #4 Exhibit Pawnee OK Stay Order, #5 Exhibit Delaware OK Stay Order, #6 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit JPML Dkt. 6437, #8 Exhibit Wis. Stay Order, #9 Exhibit Cal. Stay Order, #10 Exhibit Ky. Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 6 County Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 1 County Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 7 County Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 6 County Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit JPML Dkt. 5422, #16 Exhibit JPML Dkt. 5737, #17 Exhibit JPML Dkt. 6100, #18 Exhibit JPML Dkt. 6538, #19 Exhibit Alameda CA Stay Order, #20 Exhibit Portland ME Stay Order, #21 Exhibit EDVA Stay Order, #22 Exhibit WDVA Stay Order, #23 Exhibit Cal. Stay Order 2, #24 Exhibit Ill. Stay Order 1, #25 Exhibit Fla. Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 10, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Expedite filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting [39 and 40] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition. Defendants Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.;Anda, Inc.; Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Allergan plc f/k/aActavis plc; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.;Mallinckrodt LLC; Cephalon, Inc.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Watson Laboratories,Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson;Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a JanssenPharmaceuticals, Inc.; and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition within 45 days after the later of:1) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding the transferof this action; or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/6/2020. (mb) (mb).
January 3, 2020 Filing 40 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 3, 2020 Filing 39 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Extension)(Evans, Kyle)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond; striking #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #37 Motion to Strike Duplicate Filing. Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVSPharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition not later than 45 days from thelater of a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding thetransfer of this case or this Court rules on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/2/2020. (mb)
December 31, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Strike #36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy)
December 31, 2019 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy)
December 31, 2019 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Ashley E Quinn terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/23/19. (kmt)
December 20, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Expedite by Woodward County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P., #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Remand by Woodward County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition. Harvard Drug Group LLC The answer or other response to Plaintiffs pleading within 60 days following the later of: 1) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding the transfer of this action; or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/13/2019. (mb)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/12/19. (kmt)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Harvard Drug Group LLC The. (Ray, Ryan)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp. Defendants McKesson Corporation, CardinalHealth, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, and H. D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs pleading within 60 days from the later of: 1) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding the transfer of this action; or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/5/2019. (mb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co (McBride, D)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co . (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Service Documents)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3044742. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Woodward County, case number CJ-2019-73 filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 002 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 003 - Return of Service-Physicians Total Care Sec State, #4 Exhibit 004 - Entry of Appearance - Amerisourcebergen, #5 Exhibit 005 - Entry of Appearance - McKesson, #6 Exhibit 006 - Entry of Appearance - Quest, #7 Exhibit 007 - Return of Servcie - Keysource Medical, #8 Exhibit 008 - Return of Service - Actavia LLC, #9 Exhibit 009 - Return of Service - Actavis Pharma, #10 Exhibit 010 - Return of Service - Anda Inc, #11 Exhibit 011 - Return of Service - Anda Pharmaceuticals, #12 Exhibit 012 - Return of Service - Cardinal Health, #13 Exhibit 013 - Return of Service - Cephalon, #14 Exhibit 014 - Return of Service - CVS Pharmacy, #15 Exhibit 015 - Return of Service - Endo Pharmaceuticals, #16 Exhibit 016 - Return of Service - HD Smith-Corp Co, #17 Exhibit 017 - Return of Service - HD Smith-CT Corp, #18 Exhibit 018 - Return of Service - Johnson, #19 Exhibit 019 - Return of Service - Mallinckrodt LLC, #20 Exhibit 020 - Return of Service - Mallinckrodt PLC, #21 Exhibit 021 - Return of Service - McKesson, #22 Exhibit 022 - Return of Service - Morris & Dickson, #23 Exhibit 023 - Return of Service - Oklahoma CVS, #24 Exhibit 024 - Return of Service - Ortho-McNeil-Janssen, #25 Exhibit 025 - Return of Service - Physicians Total Care - Corp Serv Co, #26 Exhibit 026 - Return of Service - Purdue Pharma LP, #27 Exhibit 027 - Return of Service - Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #28 Exhibit 028 - Return of Service - SAJ & L&R, #29 Exhibit 029 - Return of Service - SAJ Distributors, #30 Exhibit 030 - Return of Service - Teva Pharmaceuticals, #31 Exhibit 031 - Return of Service - Walgreens Boots Alliance, #32 Exhibit 032 - Return of Service - Watson Laboratories, #33 Exhibit 033 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer - McKesson, #34 Exhibit 034 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer - Quest, #35 Exhibit 035 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer - CVS, #36 Exhibit 036 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer - Mckesson, #37 Exhibit 037 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer - Quest, #38 Exhibit 038 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer - CVS, #39 Exhibit 039 - Appearance (Cardinal), #40 Exhibit 040 - Appearance (Harvard), #41 Exhibit 041 - Appearance (HD Smith), #42 Exhibit 042 - Motion for Enlargement (HD Smith), #43 Exhibit 043 - 2019.11.21 Motion for Extension (Endo), #44 Exhibit 044 - Entry of Appearance (Anda), #45 Exhibit 045 - Motion for Extension (Anda), #46 Exhibit 046 - Motion for Extension (Endo), #47 Exhibit 047 - Order Granting Motion (Endo), #48 Exhibit 048 - Order Granting Motion (Anda), #49 Exhibit 049 - Order Granting Motion (HD Smith), #50 Exhibit 050 - LCvR7.1, #51 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodward County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saj Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodward County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?