Board of County Commissioners of Noble County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Noble County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Lynn Webster, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc, Anda Inc and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv01127
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Board of County Commissioners of Noble County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 130, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 232)(Court, Todd)
January 10, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OH Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - OH Order on Mtn to Remand)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 42 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order granting Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - JPML 6437, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wis Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Cal Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - JPML 5737, #17 Exhibit 17 - JPML 6100, #18 Exhibit 18 - JPML 6538, #19 Exhibit 19 - Alameda Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Portland Order, #21 Exhibit 21 - EDVA Order, #22 Exhibit 22 - WDVA Order, #23 Exhibit 23 - Cal Order, #24 Exhibit 24 - Ill Order, #25 Exhibit 25 - Fla Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 10, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 10, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Expedite filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING Moving Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings #38 . Moving Defendants shall file their answer, motion to dismiss, or other responsive document and/or pleading to Plaintiffs Petition not later than sixty (60) days from the later of: 1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) this Court rules on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/9/20. (md)
January 9, 2020 Filing 38 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Defendants Anda, Inc., and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., shall file their answer, motion to dismiss, or other responsive document and/or pleading to Plaintiffs Petition not later than sixty (60) days from the later of: 1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) this Court rules on any motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/7/20. (md)
January 3, 2020 Filing 36 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Extension)(Evans, Kyle)
December 20, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Expedite by Board of County Commissioners of Noble County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma L.P., #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty, Va. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P.)(Court, Todd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Remand by Board of County Commissioners of Noble County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ashley E Quinn terminated. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/20/2019. (md)
December 19, 2019 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 29 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/11/2019. (rb)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/11/2019. (rb)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #15 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/10/2019. (rb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Sharpe, G)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSING CASE Case reassigned to Honorable Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Honorable David L. Russell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/9/19. (jw)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL Pursuant to 28 U.S. C. 455, I recuse as the judge to whom this case is assigned. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return this case to the regular procedure for random selection so that a successor judge may be determined. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/9/19. (jw)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket 12-6-2019, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Summonses, #4 Exhibit Appearance (ABDC), #5 Exhibit Appearance (McKesson), #6 Exhibit Appearance (Quest), #7 Exhibit Motion for Enlargement (McKesson), #8 Exhibit Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #9 Exhibit Order Granting Motion (McKesson), #10 Exhibit Motion for Enlargement (CVS), #11 Exhibit Motion for Enlargement (McKesson), #12 Exhibit Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #13 Exhibit Appearance (Anda), #14 Exhibit Motion for Enlargement (Anda), #15 Exhibit Order Granting Motion (Endo), #16 Exhibit Order Granting Motion (Anda), #17 Exhibit Order Granting Motion (Quest), #18 Exhibit Motion for Extension (Endo), #19 Exhibit Appearance (Cardinal), #20 Exhibit Appearance (Harvard), #21 Exhibit Notice of Notice of Removal, #22 Exhibit LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 12/16/2019 (md).
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Correct the caption to reflect correct caption. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/4/19. (jw)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption and Docket to Reflect Substitution of Party by Amerisourcebergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 3, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3047607. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Noble County District Court, case number CJ-2019-5 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01-Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 02-Petition, #3 Exhibit 03-Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #4 Exhibit 04-Summons to Insys Therapeutics Inc, #5 Exhibit 05-Summons to GCP Pharma LLC, #6 Exhibit 06-Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #7 Exhibit 07-Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #8 Exhibit 08-Summons to CVS Pharmacy Inc, #9 Exhibit 09-Summons to CVS Health Corporation, #10 Exhibit 10-Summons to Cephalon Inc, #11 Exhibit 11-Summons to Cardinal Health Inc., #12 Exhibit 12-Summons to Anda Inc, #13 Exhibit 13-Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #14 Exhibit 14-Summons to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #15 Exhibit 15-Summons to Allergan PLC, #16 Exhibit 16-Summons to Actavis PLC, #17 Exhibit 17-Summons to Actavis Pharma Inc, #18 Exhibit 18-Summons to Actavis LLC, #19 Exhibit 19-Summons to McKesson Corporation, #20 Exhibit 20-Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #21 Exhibit 21-Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC., #22 Exhibit 22-Summons to Lynn Webster MD, #23 Exhibit 23-Summons to Keysource Medical Inc, #24 Exhibit 24-Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #25 Exhibit 25-Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #26 Exhibit 26-Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc., #27 Exhibit 27-Summons to Purdue Pharma LP., #28 Exhibit 28-Summons to Purdue Pharma Inc, #29 Exhibit 29-Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #30 Exhibit 30-Summons to Watson Pharma Inc., #31 Exhibit 31-Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #32 Exhibit 32-Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, #33 Exhibit 33-Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, #34 Exhibit 34-Summons to The Purdue Frederick Company, #35 Exhibit 35-Summons to The Harvard Drug Group, #36 Exhibit 36-Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #37 Exhibit 37-Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #38 Exhibit 38-Summons to Physicians Total Care Inc, #39 Exhibit 39-Summons to Physicians Total Care Inc., #40 Exhibit 40-Summons to Physicians Total Care Inc, #41 Exhibit 41-Summons to Perry Fine MD, #42 Exhibit 42-Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #43 Exhibit 43-Summons to Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #44 Exhibit 44-Summons to Morris & Dickson Co LLC, #45 Exhibit 45-Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Quest, #46 Exhibit 46-Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest, #47 Exhibit 47-Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson, #48 Exhibit 48-Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson et al, #49 Exhibit 49-Entry of Appearance by Attorney for AmerisourceBergen, #50 Exhibit 50-Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS et al, #51 Exhibit 51-Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson et al, #52 Exhibit 52-Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by AmerisourceBergen, #53 Exhibit 53-Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest, #54 Exhibit 54-Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Anda, #55 Exhibit 55-Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Anda, #56 Exhibit 56-Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Endo, #57 Exhibit 57-Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Endo, #58 Exhibit 58-Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Anda, #59 Exhibit 59-Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest, #60 Exhibit 60-State-Court Docket Sheet, #61 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners of Noble County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Represented By: Amy J Pierce
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Noble County
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?