Williams et al v. Biesek et al
Plaintiff: Keytona Reynolds, Kevin Williams and Madrell Kearney
Defendant: Point Transport LLC and Jered Biesek
Case Number: 5:2019cv01139
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Villatoro Order)(Taremi, Mehry)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collision Report)(Smolen, Daniel)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Their Response in Opposition to #7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs shall file their response in opposition to defendants' motion on or before Wednesday, January 15, 2020 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/23/2019. (ks)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Plaintiffs. (Smolen, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Jered Biesek (Jones, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Jered Biesek (Taremi, Mehry)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Taremi, Mehry)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Taremi, Mehry)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER directing attorney Lauren G. Lambright to be admitted to the bar of this court and register for electronic case filing (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/10/2019. (ks)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Point Transport LLC . (Taremi, Mehry)
December 6, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3050895. (Taremi, Mehry)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Point Transport LLC. (Taremi, Mehry)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Point Transport LLC (Taremi, Mehry)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Point Transport LLC (Jones, Daniel)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of McClain County, case number CJ-2019-222 filed by Point Transport LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_OSCN Dkt Summ, #2 Exhibit 2_Petition, #3 Exhibit 3_Summons Def Point, #4 Exhibit 4_Summons Def Biesek, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Biesek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keytona Reynolds
Represented By: Lauren G Lambright
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Williams
Represented By: Lauren G Lambright
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madrell Kearney
Represented By: Lauren G Lambright
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point Transport LLC
Represented By: Daniel K Jones
Represented By: Mehry Taremi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jered Biesek
Represented By: Lauren G Lambright
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Mehry Taremi
Represented By: Daniel K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?