Rayl et al v. Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Rayl and Kari Rayl
Defendant: Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc, Splash Transport Inc and Jeffrey Lupp
Case Number: 5:2019cv01158
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. This case is remanded to the District Court of Oklahoma County, Oklahoma. #8 Motion of Defendants Keurig Dr. Pepper and Splash to Consolidate Similar Actions is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/7/2020. (llg)
February 6, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc. (Reid, William)
February 3, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases /Motion of Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper and Splash to Consolidate Similar Actions and Brief in Support filed by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc, Splash Transport Inc. (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response re #10 MOTION to Remand. Response due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/30/2020. (llg)
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Remand /Defendant Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc.'s Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc. (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases /Motion of Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper and Splash to Consolidate Similar Actions and Brief in Support filed by Joshua Rayl(as the natural guardian of J.R. and W.R., both minors), Joshua Rayl(Individually), Kari Rayl(Individually), Kari Rayl(as the natural guardian of J.R. and W.R., both minors), Kari Rayl(as the natural gaurdian of L.S and S.S., both minors). (Abel, Timothy)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeffrey Lupp.(Paruolo, Thomas)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Jeffrey Lupp (Cowan, J)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Jeffrey Lupp (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by William E Reid on behalf of Keurig Dr Pepper Inc, Jeffrey Lupp, Splash Transport Inc (Reid, William)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of William E Reid. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/10/2020. (llg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 Receipt for Money Received in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500078040 regarding #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William E Reid (ac)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Joshua Rayl(Individually), Joshua Rayl(as the natural guardian of J.R. and W.R., both minors), Kari Rayl(as the natural guardian of J.R. and W.R., both minors), Kari Rayl(Individually), Kari Rayl(as the natural gaurdian of L.S and S.S., both minors). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit Return of Certified Mailing, #3 Exhibit Private Process Affidavit)(Abel, Timothy)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE from the Court re #9 Defendants' MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of William E. Reid. The motion will be considered once defense counsel has paid the required $50 pro hac vice fee and once defense counsel has submitted a proposed order for said motion. (llg)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc, Splash Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Paruolo, Thomas)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases /Motion of Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper and Splash to Consolidate Similar Actions and Brief in Support by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc, Splash Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Oklahoma Traffic Collision Report)(Paruolo, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc . (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Splash Transport Inc . (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc, Splash Transport Inc. (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy L Abel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abel, Timothy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Keurig Dr Pepper Inc, Splash Transport Inc (Cowan, J)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Keurig Dr Pepper Inc, Splash Transport Inc (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3055560. (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-6279 filed by Splash Transport Inc, Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Keurig Dr Pepper Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Petition_Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2019-12-02 Def Splash's Orig Answer_Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2019-12-05 Def Keurig's Orig Answer_Redacted, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket Sheet_Redacted, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Harold Busch_Redacted, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)
December 5, 2019 WESTERN DISTRICT CASE MANAGEMENT ENTRY: ANSWER to Petition by Keurig Dr Pepper Inc.(llg)
December 2, 2019 WESTERN DISTRICT CASE MANAGEMENT ENTRY: ANSWER to Petition by Splash Transport Inc.(llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayl et al v. Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keurig Dr Pepper Inc
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Represented By: William E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splash Transport Inc
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Represented By: William E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lupp
Represented By: William E Reid
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Rayl
Represented By: Timothy L Abel
Represented By: Kelly S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Rayl
Represented By: Timothy L Abel
Represented By: Kelly S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?