Woods et al v. Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Woods and Susan Woods
Defendant: American Bottling Company, The, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, American International Group, Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation, Splash Transport Inc, Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc and Jeffrey Eugene Lupp
Case Number: 5:2019cv01162
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY by Plaintiffs Susan Woods, Timothy Woods re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #40 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Deligans, R)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant The American Bottling Company's Opposition to #33 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand Out of Time. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/10/2020. (llg)
February 10, 2020 Filing 48 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs Reply In Support of Motion to Remand)(Deligans, R)
February 10, 2020 Filing 47 CONVENTIONALLY FILED EXHIBIT #45 Exhibit 1, 12/16/2019 Service Video and Exhibit 2, 1/8/2020 Service Video by Plaintiffs Susan Woods, Timothy Woods. (ac)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying as moot #24 Motion of Defendants Keurig Dr. Pepper and Splash to Consolidate Similar Actions. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/10/2020. (llg)
February 7, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Conventional Filing of Exhibit 1 & 2 of Doc. #44 by R Ryan Deligans on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Deligans, R)
February 7, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Strike #38 Response in Opposition to Motion, and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 12.16.2019 Service Video to be filed conventionally, #2 Exhibit 2 - 01.08.2020 Service Video to be filed conventionally)(Deligans, R)
January 31, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Quash /Defendants' 12(b)(5) Motion to Quash Service for Insufficient Service of Process for Defendant Lupp filed by American Bottling Company, The, Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Splash Transport Inc. (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 31, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Strike #38 Response in Opposition to Motion, and Brief in Support by American Bottling Company, The. (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 31, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases /Motion of Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper and Splash to Consolidate Similar Actions and Brief in Support filed by Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Splash Transport Inc. (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 31, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by American Bottling Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of William E. Reid, #2 Exhibit 2019-06-20 Email from Reid to Deligans, #3 Exhibit 2019-08-01 letter from Deligans to Reid, #4 Exhibit 2019-12-11 lf Oklahoma Insurance Dept to the Ins Co of Pennsylvania)(Paruolo, Thomas)
January 24, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases /Motion of Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper and Splash to Consolidate Similar Actions and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Deligans, R)
January 24, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Quash /Defendants' 12(b)(5) Motion to Quash Service for Insufficient Service of Process for Defendant Lupp filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Non-Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service)(Deligans, R)
January 21, 2020 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeffrey Eugene Lupp.(Paruolo, Thomas)
January 21, 2020 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Jeffrey Eugene Lupp (Cowan, J)
January 21, 2020 Filing 35 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Jeffrey Eugene Lupp (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 21, 2020 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by William E Reid on behalf of American Bottling Company, The, Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Jeffrey Eugene Lupp, Splash Transport Inc (Reid, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Accident Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - 12/06/19 Email to Process Server, #3 Exhibit 3 - 12/09/19 Letter to Reid, #4 Exhibit 4 - 12/06/19 Letter to OID, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Non-Service, #6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - 12/30/19 Letter to Reid & Paruolo)(Deligans, R)
January 10, 2020 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by R Ryan Deligans on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Deligans, R)
January 10, 2020 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Gunn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gunn, Andrew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Bialick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bialick, Mark)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Defendants' Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of William E Reid. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/10/2020. (llg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 28 Receipt for Money Received in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500078040 regarding #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William E Reid (ac)
January 9, 2020 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENT re #25 MOTION to Quash /Defendants' 12(b)(5) Motion to Quash Service for Insufficient Service of Process for Defendant Lupp by American Bottling Company, The, Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Splash Transport Inc. (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE from the Court re #26 Defendants' MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of William E. Reid. The motion will be considered once defense counsel has paid the required $50 pro hac vice fee and once defense counsel has submitted a proposed order for said motion.(llg)
January 8, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Bottling Company, The, Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Splash Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Paruolo, Thomas)
January 6, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Quash /Defendants' 12(b)(5) Motion to Quash Service for Insufficient Service of Process for Defendant Lupp by American Bottling Company, The, Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Splash Transport Inc. (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 6, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases /Motion of Defendants Keurig Dr Pepper and Splash to Consolidate Similar Actions and Brief in Support by Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Splash Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Oklahoma Traffic Collision Report)(Paruolo, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation . (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc . (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania . (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Splash Transport Inc . (Paruolo, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by American Bottling Company, The . (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 18 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American Bottling Company, The, Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc, Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Splash Transport Inc. (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation (Cowan, J)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Splash Transport Inc (Cowan, J)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc (Cowan, J)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Cowan, J)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Splash Transport Inc (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania.(Paruolo, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc.(Paruolo, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Splash Transport Inc.(Paruolo, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation.(Paruolo, Thomas)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Bottling Company, The.(Paruolo, Thomas)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/17/2019. (mb)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derek Cowan on behalf of American Bottling Company, The (Cowan, J)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of American Bottling Company, The (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3055946. (Paruolo, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2019-1549 filed by American Bottling Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2019-12-02 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2019-12-02 Entry of Appearance, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Jill Smith, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods et al v. Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bottling Company, The
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Represented By: William E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Represented By: William E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Pepper/7-Up Corporation
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Represented By: William E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splash Transport Inc
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Represented By: William E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Pepper Snapple Group Inc
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Represented By: William E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Eugene Lupp
Represented By: Thomas A Paruolo
Represented By: William E Reid
Represented By: J Derek Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Woods
Represented By: R Ryan Deligans
Represented By: Mark E Bialick
Represented By: Andrew M Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Woods
Represented By: R Ryan Deligans
Represented By: Mark E Bialick
Represented By: Andrew M Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?