Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners v. Cephalon Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corp, CVS Health Corp, Mallinckrodt LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Amerisourcebergen Corp, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Wal-Mart Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Sandoz Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, SPECGX LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Walgreen Co and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01166
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Docket Annotation: Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio in accordance with Doc #15 . (em)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Ohio Northern for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ank)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 the Retail Pharmacy Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Petition (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 1/24/2020. (ks)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Second Amended Petition by Wal-Mart Inc. (Ottaway, Larry)
January 8, 2020 Case reopened per #12 ORDER REINSTATING. (ank)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REINSTATNIG STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by John W Nichols for the panel on 01/08/2020. (ank)
January 8, 2020 Docket Annotation: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45009, filed 01/08/2020. (ank)
January 6, 2020 Docket Annotation: Case transferred electronically to the Northern District of Ohio. (ank)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ank)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Moving Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension Time to File Responsive Pleadings (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/23/2019. (ks)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/23/2019. (ks)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, (to File Responsive Pleadings) by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or File Other Responsive Pleading by Cardinal Health Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 18, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3057975. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 02 Petition, #3 Exhibit 03 Notice of Hearing, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Hearing, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice of Hearing, #6 Exhibit 06 Motion to Convert, #7 Exhibit 07 Entry of Appearance by counsel for plaintiff, #8 Exhibit 08 Amended Petition, #9 Exhibit 09 Second Amended Petition, #10 Exhibit 10 Summons Return - Morris & Dickson, #11 Exhibit 11 Summons Return - Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, #12 Exhibit 12 Summons Return - Watson Pharma Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 Summons Return - Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #14 Exhibit 14 Summons Return - Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 Summons Return - Ortho-McNeil_Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #16 Exhibit 16 Summons Return - Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #17 Exhibit 17 Summons Return - Cardinal Health, Inc, #18 Exhibit 18 Summons Return - Watson Laboratories, Inc, #19 Exhibit 19 Summons Return - Sandoz, Inc, #20 Exhibit 20 Summons Return - Mallinckrodt LLC, #21 Exhibit 21 Summons Return - CVS Pharmacy, #22 Exhibit 22 Summons Return - Mallinckrodt PLC, #23 Exhibit 23 Special Appearance and Unopposed Motion., #24 Exhibit 24 Order Granting Unopposed Motion, #25 Exhibit 25 State-Court Docket Sheet, #26 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners v. Cephalon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Don W Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Robert H Alexander, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: Jordyn L Cartmell
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Don W Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Jessica L Dark
Represented By: Robert S Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall J Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?