Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. T. Demont LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Travis Demont Burdine and T. Demont LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01194
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph P Titterington on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Titterington, Joseph)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan R Janis on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Janis, Ryan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for plaintiff to file an entry of appearance according to LCvR83.4 not later than 01/03/2020; plaintiff shall also comply with the local counsel requirement of LCvR83.3. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/31/2019. (lam)
December 30, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3063995. (Janis, Ryan)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Travis Demont Burdine, T. Demont LLC. (ac)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travis Demont Burdine, T. Demont LLC filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. T. Demont LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Ryan R Janis
Represented By: Joseph P Titterington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Demont Burdine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Demont LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?