Nicely v. Cox Enterprises Inc
Plaintiff: Kyle Nicely
Defendant: Cox Enterprises Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00036
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Cox Enterprises Inc.(Stewart, Leasa)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cox Enterprises Inc answer due 3/5/2020. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 2/4/2020. (md)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cox Enterprises Inc. (Stewart, Leasa)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Leasa M Stewart on behalf of Cox Enterprises Inc (Stewart, Leasa)
January 9, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3071668. (Shook, Jonathan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Cox Enterprises Inc. (rb)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cox Enterprises Inc filed by Kyle Nicely. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicely v. Cox Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Leasa M Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Nicely
Represented By: Jonathan E Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?