Citizens Bankshares Inc et al v. Security National Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp, Citizens Bankshares Inc and Citizens State Bank
Defendant: Amtrust North America Inc and Security National Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00051
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/3/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/12/2021 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501 before Honorable Robin J. Cauthron.Entered at the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 03/05/20. (wh)
March 3, 2020 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher T Combs on behalf of Amtrust North America Inc, Security National Insurance Company (Combs, Christopher)
February 28, 2020 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (Duncan, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (Duncan, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (Duncan, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp, Citizens Bankshares Inc, Citizens State Bank. (Smith, Spencer)
February 18, 2020 Docket Annotation: Correction for docket entry #17 - Joint Status Report for scheduling conference shall be filed no later than Friday, February 28, 2020. (wh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 17 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 @ 10:50 AM in Chambers before Honorable Robin J. Cauthron, Room 4001. (wh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Security National Insurance Company . (Price, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amtrust North America Inc . (Price, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey S Price on behalf of All Defendants (Price, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin D Wear on behalf of All Defendants (Wear, Justin)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Jeffrey S. Price. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 1/31/20. (wh)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Justin D. Wear. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 1/31/20. (wh)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Jeffrey Price Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3086703 by Amtrust North America Inc, Security National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac (Price))(Magrini, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Justin Wear Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3086679 by Amtrust North America Inc, Security National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac (Wear)))(Magrini, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Amtrust North America Inc, Security National Insurance Company.(Magrini, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan B Gatewood on behalf of Amtrust North America Inc, Security National Insurance Company (Gatewood, Evan)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Hayley N K McAllister on behalf of Amtrust North America Inc, Security National Insurance Company (McAllister, Hayley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert L Magrini on behalf of Amtrust North America Inc, Security National Insurance Company (Magrini, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T Luttrell, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Luttrell, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Duncan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Duncan, Michael)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Spencer F Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Spencer)
January 17, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3077199. (Magrini, Robert)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-3675 filed by Security National Insurance Company, Amtrust North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and First Amended Petition to AmTrust, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and First Amended Petition to SNIC, #3 Exhibit 3 - OSCN Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Bankshares Inc et al v. Security National Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp
Represented By: Robert T Luttrell, III
Represented By: Michael A Duncan
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Bankshares Inc
Represented By: Robert T Luttrell, III
Represented By: Michael A Duncan
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens State Bank
Represented By: Robert T Luttrell, III
Represented By: Michael A Duncan
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrust North America Inc
Represented By: Evan B Gatewood
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Represented By: Hayley N K McAllister
Represented By: Christopher T Combs
Represented By: Justin D Wear
Represented By: Jeffrey S Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security National Insurance Company
Represented By: Evan B Gatewood
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Represented By: Hayley N K McAllister
Represented By: Christopher T Combs
Represented By: Justin D Wear
Represented By: Jeffrey S Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?