United States of America v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Michael Ray Brown and BancFirst of Oklahoma
Case Number: 5:2020cv00073
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Skye D Shephard-Wood on behalf of Michael Ray Brown (Shephard-Wood, Skye)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. BancFirst of Oklahoma served on 1/31/2020. (Sewell, Kay)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Michael Ray Brown served on 1/29/2020. (Sewell, Kay)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kay D Sewell on behalf of United States of America (Sewell, Kay)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to BancFirst of Oklahoma, Michael Ray Brown. (ank)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BancFirst of Oklahoma, Michael Ray Brown filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - UCC Financial Statement, #3 Exhibit 3 - SIGNED Verification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ray Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BancFirst of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kay D Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?