Wauhob v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Connie Wauhob
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc and Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 5:2020cv00171
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph S Carson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carson, Joseph)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Plaintiff shall enter an appearance within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 04/01/2020. (jb)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East LP.(Brewer, Michael)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court)(Brewer, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/28/2020. (mb)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/28/2020. (mb)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael)
February 28, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3107421. (Brewer, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-714 filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wauhob v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Wauhob
Represented By: Joseph S Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?