United States of America v. Geis et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jeremy Lynn Geis, Kiowa County Treasurer, Discover Card, England Ford, Western Equipment, Kaeley Breze-Ann Coffey-Geis, Kiowa County Board of County Commissioners, Ford Motor Credit LLC and Wanda F Meyers
Case Number: 5:2020cv00174
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings. This case is thus stayed and the Summons are stayed until May 29, 2020. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 4/2/2020. (ks)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Case by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. England Ford served on 3/3/2020. (Sewell, Kay)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Ford Motor Credit LLC served on 3/3/2020. (Sewell, Kay)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Discover Card served on 3/2/2020. (Sewell, Kay)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kiowa County Board of County Commissioners served on 3/3/2020. (Sewell, Kay)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kiowa County Treasurer served on 3/4/2020. (Sewell, Kay)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Wanda F Meyers(as Trustee of the Wanda F Meyers Trust) served on 3/2/2020; Wanda F Meyers(Individually) served on 3/2/2020. (Sewell, Kay)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jeremy Lynn Geis served on 3/15/2020. (Sewell, Kay)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle N Eastwood on behalf of Wanda F Meyers(as Trustee of the Wanda F Meyers Trust), Wanda F Meyers(Individually) (Eastwood, Kyle)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Wanda F Meyers(as Trustee of the Wanda F Meyers Trust), Wanda F Meyers(Individually).(Eastwood, Kyle)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kay D Sewell on behalf of United States of America (Sewell, Kay)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kaeley Breze-Ann Coffey-Geis, Discover Card, England Ford, Ford Motor Credit LLC, Jeremy Lynn Geis, Kiowa County Board of County Commissioners, Kiowa County Treasurer, Wanda F Meyers(as Trustee of the Wanda F Meyers Trust), Wanda F Meyers(Individually), Western Equipment. (ank)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Promissory Notes, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 3 - FSA-2028 01-14-14, #4 Exhibit 4 - FSA-2028 04-02-13, #5 Exhibit 5 - SOA-1, #6 Exhibit 6 - LIEN INFO, #7 Exhibit 7 - Tax Statement- Kiowa Co, #8 Exhibit 8 - UCC Financing, #9 Exhibit 9 - EFS, #10 Exhibit 10 - Verification, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Geis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Lynn Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiowa County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: England Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaeley Breze-Ann Coffey-Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiowa County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda F Meyers
Represented By: Kyle N Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kay D Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?