Holler v. BI Willow LLC et al
Plaintiff: Glennis M Holler
Defendant: BI Willow LLC and Bon Investments USA LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00188
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY by Plaintiff Glennis M Holler to Defendants' Objection and Response to Motion to Remand filed by Glennis M Holler. (Ewbank, Andrew)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BI Willow LLC, Bon Investments USA LLC. (Foster, Nicholas)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Glennis M Holler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons Return)(Ewbank, Andrew)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Bon Investments USA LLC . (Foster, Nicholas)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by BI Willow LLC . (Foster, Nicholas)
March 13, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3119166. (Folluo, Dan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Garfield County, case number CJ-2020-41 filed by Bon Investments USA LLC, BI Willow LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons Issued BI Willow, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Issued Bon Investments, #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Summons BI Willow, #5 Exhibit 5 - Return of Summons Bon Investments, #6 Exhibit 6 - Special Reservation of Time BI Willow, #7 Exhibit 7 - EOA Nicholas Foster for Defs, #8 Exhibit 8 - EOA Dan Folluo for Defs, #9 Exhibit 9 - Special Reservation of Time Bon Investments, #10 Exhibit 10 - State Court Docket Sheet, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holler v. BI Willow LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BI Willow LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J Foster
Represented By: Dan S Folluo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bon Investments USA LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J Foster
Represented By: Dan S Folluo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glennis M Holler
Represented By: Andrew S Ewbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?