Continental Resources Inc v. Wolla Oilfield Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Continental Resources Inc
Defendant: Jason Wolla and Wolla Oilfield Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00200
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Defendants, Wolla Oilfield Services LLC and Jason Wolla's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move Against or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; Defendants are hereby given until May 26, 2020, within which to answer, move against or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 4/21/2020. (ks)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Wolla Oilfield Services LLC . (Webber, Daniel)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Move Against or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jason Wolla, Wolla Oilfield Services LLC. (Webber, Daniel)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Chance L Pearson on behalf of Jason Wolla, Wolla Oilfield Services LLC (Pearson, Chance)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel G Webber, Jr on behalf of Jason Wolla, Wolla Oilfield Services LLC (Webber, Daniel)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Resources Inc. Jason Wolla served on 4/3/2020; Wolla Oilfield Services LLC served on 4/3/2020. (Merkley, Nicholas)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jason Wolla, Wolla Oilfield Services LLC. (ank)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Continental Resources Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Continental Resources Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
March 5, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3112630. (Merkley, Nicholas)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Wolla, Wolla Oilfield Services LLC filed by Continental Resources Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wolla Oilfield Services LLC MSC, #2 Exhibit 2 - WollaGeneral Rate Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Timesheet Example, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Resources Inc v. Wolla Oilfield Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Wolla
Represented By: Chance L Pearson
Represented By: Daniel G Webber, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolla Oilfield Services LLC
Represented By: Chance L Pearson
Represented By: Daniel G Webber, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Resources Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?