Galatian v. CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Galatian
Defendant: CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00229
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Stay Case to the extent stated herein and the parties respective deadlines (including all time periods pending as of the filing of the parties motion on May 1, 2020) are extended by 14 days. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 5/4/2020. (md)
May 1, 2020 Filing 29 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case (Court Deadlines and Proceedings) by CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC. (Rector, Jonathan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 28 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 09:45 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 5/28/2020. (md)
April 16, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Gregory Scott Galatian. (Nilges, Hans)
April 16, 2020 Filing 26 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Motion For Partial Judgement on the Pleadings by Gregory Scott Galatian. (Nilges, Hans)
April 16, 2020 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT re #16 Brief, #15 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally and Authorize Notice by Gregory Scott Galatian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Angela Fisher)(Nilges, Hans)
April 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE (other) by Gregory Scott Galatian Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Consent of Angela Fisher)(Nilges, Hans)
April 14, 2020 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Christian A Angotti on behalf of CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC (Angotti, Christian)
April 14, 2020 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT re #16 Brief, #15 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally and Authorize Notice by Gregory Scott Galatian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evan Green)(Nilges, Hans)
April 13, 2020 Filing 21 Entry of Appearance by Robert W Pritchard on behalf of CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC (Pritchard, Robert) Modified on 4/16/2020 (md).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert W. Pritchard; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christian A. Angotti. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 4/13/2020. (md)
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christian A. Angotti Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3135971 by CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Craft, Jessica)
April 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Pritchard Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3135939 by CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Craft, Jessica)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE (other) by Gregory Scott Galatian Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Consent of Evan Green)(Nilges, Hans)
April 10, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally and Authorize Notice by Gregory Scott Galatian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declarations)(Nilges, Hans)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally and Authorize Notice by Gregory Scott Galatian. (Nilges, Hans)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE (other) by Gregory Scott Galatian Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Consent of James Mitchell Hatch)(Nilges, Hans)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Relief From Local Counsel Requirement. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 4/7/2020. (md)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC.(Rector, Jonathan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC . (Rector, Jonathan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Order (for Relief of Local Counsel Requirement) by CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC. (Rector, Jonathan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan G Rector on behalf of CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC (Rector, Jonathan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Plaintiff Gregory Scott Galatian. (White, Edward)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE (other) by Gregory Scott Galatian Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consents)(Nilges, Hans)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon M Draher on behalf of Gregory Scott Galatian (Draher, Shannon)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Hans A Nilges on behalf of Gregory Scott Galatian (Nilges, Hans)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry D Green on behalf of Gregory Scott Galatian (Green, Kerry)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward L White on behalf of Gregory Scott Galatian (White, Edward)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC. (rb)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC filed by Gregory Scott Galatian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - Galatian Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)
March 12, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3118776. (White, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galatian v. CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Galatian
Represented By: Edward L White
Represented By: Shannon M Draher
Represented By: Kerry D Green
Represented By: Hans A Nilges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic of Tennessee LLC
Represented By: Jonathan G Rector
Represented By: Christian A Angotti
Represented By: Robert W Pritchard
Represented By: Jessica L Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?