Holland v. Aaron's Inc
Plaintiff: Reginald Holland
Defendant: Aaron's Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00259
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court Oklahoma, Kiowa County filed by Aaron's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summary for Contents 1, #4 Exhibit 4 - Estimate, #5 Exhibit 5 - Estimate, #6 Exhibit 6 - Estimate)(McVicker, Jason)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court Oklahoma, Kiowa County by Reginald Holland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Woodson, Kelli)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelli R Woodson on behalf of Reginald Holland (Woodson, Kelli)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Aaron's Inc.(McVicker, Jason)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Aaron's Inc . (McVicker, Jason)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason A McVicker on behalf of Aaron's Inc (McVicker, Jason)
March 19, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3123179. (McVicker, Jason)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Kiowa County, case number CJ-2019-34 filed by Aaron's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 Zillow Estimate, #4 Exhibit 4 Summons and Return to Flores Rentals dba Aarons, #5 Exhibit 5 Special Appearance and Mt to Dismiss of Flores Rentals dba Aarons, #6 Exhibit 6 Summons and Return to Aarons Inc, #7 Exhibit 7 Affidavit of Mailing, #8 Exhibit 8 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit 9 Kiowa County Docket Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Aaron's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Holland
Represented By: Thomas W Talley
Represented By: Kelli R Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron's Inc
Represented By: Jason A McVicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?