Tejada v. CSI Measurement, LLC
Plaintiff: David Tejada
Defendant: CSI Measurement, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00324
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by CSI Measurement, LLC . (Davis, April)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by April M C Davis on behalf of CSI Measurement, LLC (Davis, April)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by CSI Measurement, LLC.(Davis, April)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to CSI Measurement, LLC. (knt)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00143.
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (sac, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 4/8/2020.]
April 8, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #6 ) (sac, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 4/8/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the Court Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Western District of Oklahoma., transferring case (terminates case) (Re: #2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 4/8/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CSI Measurement, LLC (alg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 4/8/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (jjs, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 4/8/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Richard Paul Liebowitz (jjs, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 4/8/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CSI Measurement, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2193514) by David Tejada (With attachments) (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 4/8/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by David Tejada (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from Oklahoma Northern on 4/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tejada v. CSI Measurement, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tejada
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSI Measurement, LLC
Represented By: April M C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?