Garza v. Fusion Industries, LLC
Plaintiff: Javier Garza
Defendant: Fusion Industries LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00336
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:20-cv-00072.
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by District Judge Kea W. Riggs granting #16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue. This matter shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma for all further proceedings. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer the file to that court upon entry of this order. (ve) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue by Fusion Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lamont, Charlotte) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL ORIGINAL COMPLAINT CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION by District Judge Kea W. Riggs granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due 4/10/2020. (ve) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Fusion Industries, LLC. (Lamont, Charlotte) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 10. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION by District Judge Kea W. Riggs granting #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint Class and Collective Action Fusion Industries, LLC; Answer due 3/27/2020. (ve) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint Class and Collective Action by Fusion Industries, LLC. (Lamont, Charlotte) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Javier Garza. Fusion Industries, LLC served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Foty, Don) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Fusion Industries, LLC. (aek) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Javier Garza certificate that non-member attorney is a member in good standing of the bar of a state (Faber, Daniel) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Javier Garza by Daniel M. Faber on behalf of: Don Foty Hodges & Foty 4409 Montrose Blvd., Ste. 200Houston, TX 77006 7135230001 DFoty@hftrialfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Faber, Daniel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Faber on behalf of Javier Garza (Faber, Daniel) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6939085 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Javier Garza (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Faber, Daniel) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Javier Garza consent to join collective action (Faber, Daniel) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Javier Garza civil cover sheet (Faber, Daniel) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Javier Garza ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Javier Garza. (Faber, Daniel) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (ln) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6918244 re #1 Complaint filed by Javier Garza (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Faber, Daniel) [Transferred from New Mexico on 4/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. Fusion Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fusion Industries LLC
Represented By: Charlotte A. Lamont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Garza
Represented By: Don Foty
Represented By: Daniel M. Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?