Nelson et al v. IBTS-Community Services LLC
Plaintiff: Jessie Nelson and Lou Nelson
Defendant: IBTS-Community Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00362
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 7/1/2020; Motions to amend due 7/1/2020; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/20/2020; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days t/a; Pla witness list due 9/10/2020; Dft witness list due 14 days t/a; Pla exhibit list due 9/10/2020; Dft exhibit list due 14 days t/a; Motions in limine due 12/22/2020; Jury instructions & verdict forms due 12/22/2020; Voir dire requests due 12/22/2020; Trial briefs due 12/22/2020; Discovery due by 12/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/12/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 401 before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 10/1/2020. Pretrial Report due by 12/22/2020. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 6/8/2020. (llg)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Jessie Nelson, Lou Nelson. (Buxton, James)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 ENTER ORDER. Under General Order 20-6, and in order to reduce in-person courthouse proceedings, the status/scheduling conference set for 6/8/2020 will be conducted telephonically. Counsel who plan to participate in the status/scheduling conference are DIRECTED to make arrangements for telephonic appearance not later than 6/3/2020, by contacting the courtroom deputy at the email address provided in this order. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 6/1/2020. (llg)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2020 10:15 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 6/3/2020. (llg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by IBTS-Community Services LLC (Day, Seth)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ty E Schoenhals on behalf of IBTS-Community Services LLC (Schoenhals, Ty)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by IBTS-Community Services LLC . (Day, Seth)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by IBTS-Community Services LLC.(Day, Seth)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Seth A Day on behalf of IBTS-Community Services LLC (Day, Seth)
April 20, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3140372. (Day, Seth)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Texas County, case number CJ-2020-13 filed by IBTS- Community Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition., #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons.pdf, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons.pdf, #4 Exhibit 4 - OSCN Case Details., #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. IBTS-Community Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBTS-Community Services LLC
Represented By: Seth A Day
Represented By: Ty E Schoenhals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Nelson
Represented By: James B Buxton, II
Represented By: Logan T Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Nelson
Represented By: James B Buxton, II
Represented By: Logan T Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?