Yearwood v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tracey Yearwood
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv00373
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re #3 Summons Returned Executed by Tracey Yearwood. (Knapp, John)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney for the Western District of Oklahoma on 04/27/2020, filed by Plaintiff Tracey Yearwood. (Knapp, John)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Summons and Complaint served on United States Attorney General on 04/30/2020, filed by Plaintiff Tracey Yearwood. (Knapp, John)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracey Yearwood. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 4/27/2020. (Knapp, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (kmt)
April 23, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3142406. (Knapp, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration filed by Tracey Yearwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yearwood v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Yearwood
Represented By: John Thomas-Hohn Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?