Plains Marketing LP v. Coffey et al
Plaintiff: Plains Marketing LP
Defendant: Department of Justice, Kevin M Coffey and Davis Directional Drilling LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00418
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION by Department of Justice Declaration of Curtis Weidler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ball Ranch Work Order, #2 Exhibit Major Services Contract)(Weidler, Curtis)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION by Department of Justice Declaration of IRS Senior Counsel Ann Darnold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Weidler, Curtis)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Department of Justice. (Weidler, Curtis)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Department of Justice. (Weidler, Curtis)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Curtis J Weidler on behalf of Department of Justice (Weidler, Curtis)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plains Marketing LP. (Nelson, Lyle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Plains Marketing LP. (Nelson, Lyle)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 7/2/2020. (md)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 Case transferred in - Bankruptcy Matter Withdrawal of Reference; Case Number 17-12667-JDL Adv. Proc. 18-01121. filed by Plains Marketing LP. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Petition #17-12267-JDL Docket, #2 Adversary Proceeding # 18-01121-JDL Docket, #3 Record of Adversary Proceeding # 18-01121-JDL)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plains Marketing LP v. Coffey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plains Marketing LP
Represented By: Lyle R Nelson
Represented By: Wyatt D Swinford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Curtis J Weidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M Coffey
Represented By: Kevin M Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Directional Drilling LLC
Represented By: Mitchell D Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?