Greer County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Greer County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, CVS Health Corp, Mallinckrodt LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Actavis plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Saj Distributors, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Allergan plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv00456
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
July 1, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Greer County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 130, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 232)(Court, Todd)
June 30, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Expedite filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
June 30, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
June 29, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stmt of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
June 12, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Expedite filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
June 12, 2020 Filing 36 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - CTO 156, #8 Exhibit 8 - WI Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - CA Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - JMPL 5737, #17 Exhibit 17 - JPML 6100, #18 Exhibit 18 - JPML 6538, #19 Exhibit 19 - Transfer Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - JPML 7403, #21 Exhibit 21 - JPML 7543, #22 Exhibit 22 - JPML 7573, #23 Exhibit 23 - CA Stay Order, #24 Exhibit 24 - Alameda Stay Order, #25 Exhibit 25 - Portland v Purdue, #26 Exhibit 26 - EDVA Order, #27 Exhibit 27 - WDVA Order, #28 Exhibit 28 - CA Order, #29 Exhibit 29 - IL Order, #30 Exhibit 30 - FL Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
June 9, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Expedite by Greer County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, #3 Exhibit 3 - Town of Randolph v. Purdue Pharma, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie Cty Va. v. Purdue Pharma, #5 Exhibit 5 - Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma)(Court, Todd)
June 9, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Remand by Greer County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer,Move, or Otherwise Respond Under Rule 12. Defendants shall file an answer or otherresponsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint not more than 60 days followingthe latter of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this actionto the MDL Panel.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/29/2020. (mb)
May 27, 2020 Filing 32 AMENDED DOCUMENT by McKesson Corp. Amendment to #27 Supplement,, Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Summonses, #4 Exhibit Entry, #5 Exhibit Entry, #6 Exhibit Entry, #7 Exhibit Entry, #8 Exhibit Motion, #9 Exhibit Order, #10 Exhibit Entry, #11 Exhibit Motion, #12 Exhibit Order, #13 Exhibit Notice, #14 Exhibit Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Defendants CVSHealth Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. andWalgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Defendants shall file an answer or otherresponsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint not more than 60 days followingthe latter of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/27/2020. (mb)
May 27, 2020 Filing 30 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Anda Inc and Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint not more than 60 days following the latter of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this actionto the MDL Panel.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/27/2020. (mb)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Movants shall file an answer or otherresponsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint not more than 60 days following the latter of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/27/2020. (mb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance (ABDC), #5 Exhibit 5 - Appearance (Cardinal), #6 Exhibit 6 - Appearance (Harvard), #7 Exhibit 7 - Appearance (McKesson), #8 Exhibit 8 - Motion for Extension (McKesson), #9 Exhibit 9 - Order Granting Extension (McKesson), #10 Exhibit 10 - Appearance (Quest), #11 Exhibit 11 - Motion for Enlargement (CVS), #12 Exhibit 12 - Order Granting Ext (Quest), #13 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #14 Exhibit 14 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart)
May 26, 2020 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
May 26, 2020 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, (to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12) by CVS Health Corp, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy)
May 22, 2020 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
May 22, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
May 22, 2020 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle)
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Motion to Correct Caption and Docket. Clerk of Court is directed to correct the docket to show that AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is the party defendant. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/21/2020. (mb)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc answer due 7/21/2020. Defendant shall file its answer or otherresponsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint not more than sixty (60) days following the latter of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/21/2020. (mb)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption and Docket by Amerisourcebergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 05/19/2020. (nv)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman recused. The Clerk of the Court to place this case number in the random draw for reassignment to another Judge of the Court. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 05/19/2020. (nv)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
May 19, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3156025. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Greer County, case number CJ-19-12 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Process documents - Endo, #2 Exhibit 02 State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 03 Petition, #4 Exhibit 04 Summons - Actavis LLC, #5 Exhibit 05 Summons - Actavis PLC, #6 Exhibit 06 Summons - Actavis Pharma Inc, #7 Exhibit 07 Summons - Allergan PLC, #8 Exhibit 08 Summons - AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #9 Exhibit 09 Summons - Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 Summons - Anda Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 Summons - Cardinal Health Inc, #12 Exhibit 12 Summons - Cephalon Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 Summons - CVS Health Corporation, #14 Exhibit 14 Summons - CVS Pharmacy Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 Summons - Endo Health Solutions Inc, #16 Exhibit 16 Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #17 Exhibit 17 Summons - GCP Pharma LLC, #18 Exhibit 18 Summons - HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, #19 Exhibit 19 Summons - HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, #20 Exhibit 20 Summons - HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, #21 Exhibit 21 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #22 Exhibit 22 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceutic inc, #23 Exhibit 23 Summons - Johnson and Johnson, #24 Exhibit 24 Summons - Keysource Medical In, #25 Exhibit 25 Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC, #26 Exhibit 26 Summons - Mallinckrodt PLC, #27 Exhibit 27 Summons - McKesson Corporation, #28 Exhibit 28 Summons - Morris and Dickson Co LLC, #29 Exhibit 29 Summons - Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #30 Exhibit 30 Summons - Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #31 Exhibit 31 Summons - Physicians Total Care Inc, #32 Exhibit 32 Summons - Physicians Total Care Inc, #33 Exhibit 33 Summons - Physicians Total Care Inc, #34 Exhibit 34 Summons - Purdue Pharma Inc, #35 Exhibit 35 Summons - Purdue Pharma LP, #36 Exhibit 36 Summons - Quest Pharmaceuticals inc, #37 Exhibit 37 Summons - SAJ Distributors, #38 Exhibit 38 Summons - SAJ Distributors, #39 Exhibit 39 Summons - Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, #40 Exhibit 40 Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #41 Exhibit 41 Summons - The Harvard Drug Group, #42 Exhibit 42 Summons - The Purdue Frederick Company, #43 Exhibit 43 Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, #44 Exhibit 44 Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, #45 Exhibit 45 Summons - Watson Pharma Inc, #46 Exhibit 46 Summons - Watson Laboratories Inc, #47 Exhibit 47 Summons - Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #48 Exhibit 48 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for ABDC, #49 Exhibit 49 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson, #50 Exhibit 50 Motion and Special Appearance by McKesson et al, #51 Exhibit 51 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Harvard Drug, #52 Exhibit 52 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal Health, #53 Exhibit 53 Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party, #54 Exhibit 54 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Quest Pharmaceuticals, #55 Exhibit 55 Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest, #56 Exhibit 56 Special Appearance and Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS et al, #57 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Caleb S McKee
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corp
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saj Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Represented By: Caleb S McKee
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greer County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?