Contreras Alvarado v. Wolf et al
Petitioner: Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado
Respondent: Chad F Wolf, Don Jones, Matthew T Albence and Marc J Moore
Case Number: 5:2020cv00509
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Morgan Von Borstel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/4/20. (lb)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Emily Rose Craven. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/4/20. (lb)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Patrick Eby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/4/20. (lb)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles Roth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/4/20. (lb)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Response re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado. The Court orders Respondents to respond by 6/10/20. Petitioner may file a reply by 6/15/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/3/20. (lb)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Megan Von Borstel Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3164772 by Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Goodman, Jimmy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Rose Craven Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3164768 by Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Goodman, Jimmy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Patrick Eby Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3164766 by Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Goodman, Jimmy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles Roth Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3164744 by Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Goodman, Jimmy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Receipt for Money Received from Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500080245 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (knt)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jimmy K Goodman on behalf of Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado (Goodman, Jimmy)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Charles Goodwin on 5/29/2020. (rb)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (rb)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit 2- Immigration Court Order, #3 Exhibit 3- Craven e-mails to E. Fontanez, #4 Exhibit 4- Cooper Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 5- ERO Field Guidance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras Alvarado v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Don Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marc J Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Lizbeth Contreras Alvarado
Represented By: Jimmy K Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?