Ng v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Sai Ngo Ng
Respondent: Mario Ortiz, Anthony Bramonte, Corey Price, William Pelham Barr and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv00539
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Relief from the Local Court Rule Requiring Association with Local Counsel. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/7/20. (jw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 FIRST MOTION for Order (no opposition to Petitioner's motion) filed by All Defendants. (Evans, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION for Order by Sai Ngo Ng. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Presti, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Don Evans, Jr on behalf of William Pelham Barr, Anthony Bramonte, Mario Ortiz, Corey Price, Chad Wolf (Evans, Robert)
July 20, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sai Ngo Ng. On June 10, 2020, this action was transferred to this district from the Western District of Texas. It appears from the record that plaintiff is represented by Michael M. Presti, whose office is located in Dallas, Texas. As Mr. Presti is apparently not a resident of, and does not maintain an office in, Oklahoma, he is required to comply with LCvR83.3(a), which requires association of non-resident counsel with local counsel. Accordingly, Mr. Presti is granted until July 27, 2020, to show association with local counsel as required by LCvR83.3(a).. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 7/13/20. (jw)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Sai Ngo Ng. (Presti, Michael)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael M Presti on behalf of Sai Ngo Ng (Presti, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00159.
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that, under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma in Oklahoma City. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/10/2020.]
June 9, 2020 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (em) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/10/2020.]
June 8, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (jg1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/10/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/10/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0542-13639168), filed by Sai Ngo Ng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Presti, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ng v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mario Ortiz
Represented By: Magdalena G Jara
Represented By: Robert Don Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Bramonte
Represented By: Magdalena G Jara
Represented By: Robert Don Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Corey Price
Represented By: Magdalena G Jara
Represented By: Robert Don Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Pelham Barr
Represented By: Magdalena G Jara
Represented By: Robert Don Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Magdalena G Jara
Represented By: Robert Don Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sai Ngo Ng
Represented By: Michael Milone Presti
Represented By: Michael M Presti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?