Carr v. Lister
Plaintiff: Tyrone Lee Carr
Defendant: Suzanne Lister
Case Number: 5:2020cv00551
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Agency Having Custody of Plaintiff for Payment of Inmate Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 8/4/20. (lb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Receipt for Money Received from Tyrone Lee Carr in the amount of $37.00, receipt number OKW500081151 regarding #1 Complaint. Remailing balance is 313. Receipt mailed to Tyrone Lee Carr #188501 HOLDENVILLE-DCF 6888 E 133rd Rd Holdenville, OK 74848-9033 (dtb)
July 20, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #6 Motion for Order. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $37.00 on or before 7/27/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 7/6/20. (lb)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Order by Tyrone Lee Carr. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (em)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyrone Lee Carr. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ODOC Offender Statement Report, #2 Envelope)(em)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Deficiency on or before 7/8/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/17/20. (lb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Entered at the direction Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 6/11/2020. (em)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 PREVIOUS Cases (em)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Suzanne Lister filed by Tyrone Lee Carr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Dated 5/3/19 from Michael Bush to Stephen Sullins, #2 Envelope)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Lister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Lister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Lee Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?