Schmidt v. Prudential Insurance Company of America The
Plaintiff: Clint L Schmidt
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America The
Case Number: 5:2020cv00574
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER : Defendant shall disclose the administrative record to Plaintiff on or before September 30, 2020. The deadline to amend the pleadings or add parties should be October 18, 2020. Defendant shall file an Agreed Administrative Record by November 4, 2020. The Plaintiffs opening ERISA brief shall be filed February 2, 2021. The Defendants response brief shall be filed March 2, 2021. Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before March 17, 2021. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/6/20. (jw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob F.M. Oslick on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America The (Oslick, Jacob)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Clint L Schmidt. (Dickinson, Roy)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Ian H Morrison on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America The (Morrison, Ian)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Oslick; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ian Morrison. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 7/21/20. (jw)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ian Morrison Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3197224 by Prudential Insurance Company of America The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ian Morrison)(Turner, William)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Oslick Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3197160 by Prudential Insurance Company of America The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Oslick)(Turner, William)
July 21, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET : Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2000 09:45 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 8/3/2020. (jw)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Prudential Insurance Company of America The.(Turner, William)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by William K Turner on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America The (Turner, William)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Prudential Insurance Company of America The . (Turner, William)
June 17, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3175878. (Turner, William)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2020-495(V) filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Service on Oklahoma Insurance Commissioner, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt v. Prudential Insurance Company of America The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America The
Represented By: William K Turner
Represented By: Jacob F.M. Oslick
Represented By: Ian H Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint L Schmidt
Represented By: Roy S Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?