Alexander v. LL Oak One LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Alexander, Jr
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc, LL Oak One LLC and LL Oak One LLC doing business as Landers Chevrolet of Norman
Case Number: 5:2020cv00603
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LL Oak One LLC. (Shephard, C)
July 21, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Alexander, Jr. (Boyer, Jared)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jared R Boyer on behalf of John Alexander, Jr (Boyer, Jared)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney K Hunsinger, II on behalf of John Alexander, Jr (Hunsinger, Rodney)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER LL Oak shall, within fourteen days, file asupplement to its Notice of Removal indicating whether each trust which forms part of the ownership hierarchy of LL Oak is a traditional trust or a business trust and, if necessary, identify the members of such trusts and their respective citizenships. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/8/2020. (md)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by LL Oak One LLC.(Shephard, C)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by LL Oak One LLC . (Shephard, C)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by C Eric Shephard on behalf of LL Oak One LLC (Shephard, C)
June 24, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3180563. (Shephard, C)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2020-546 filed by LL Oak One LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- EOA, #3 Exhibit 3- Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- Summonses, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. LL Oak One LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alexander, Jr
Represented By: Jared R Boyer
Represented By: Rodney K Hunsinger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LL Oak One LLC
Represented By: C Eric Shephard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LL Oak One LLC doing business as Landers Chevrolet of Norman
Represented By: C Eric Shephard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?