Jones et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Selena M Jones and Martreo K Jones
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00684
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Stipe, Amy)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. A review of the filings in this case reveals that Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, which requires in relevant part that a party must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1). This Court therefore ORDERS Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to file within 7 days of this Order its Corporate Disclosure Statement. A civil form called "Corporate Disclosure Form" is available on the website for the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, under the tab "Forms." Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 09/09/2020. (nv)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Stipe, Amy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy M Stipe on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Stipe, Amy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jace T White on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (White, Jace)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Lance E Leffel on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Leffel, Lance)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martreo K Jones, Selena M Jones. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service - Green Card)(Landeros, Shawna)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (em)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by J Logan Johnson on behalf of Martreo K Jones, Selena M Jones (Johnson, J)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Bradley Miller on behalf of Martreo K Jones, Selena M Jones (Miller, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Shawna L Landeros on behalf of Martreo K Jones, Selena M Jones (Landeros, Shawna)
July 16, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Complaint Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3192770. (Landeros, Shawna)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed by Martreo K Jones, Selena M Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena M Jones
Represented By: Robert Bradley Miller
Represented By: Shawna L Landeros
Represented By: J Logan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martreo K Jones
Represented By: Robert Bradley Miller
Represented By: Shawna L Landeros
Represented By: J Logan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jace T White
Represented By: Amy M Stipe
Represented By: Lance E Leffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?