BNSF Railway Company v. City of Moore Oklahoma
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Defendant: City of Moore Oklahoma
Case Number: 5:2020cv00714
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY by Defendant City of Moore Oklahoma re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Moore Oklahoma. (Burch, Derek)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BNSF Railway Company. (McClellan, Deric)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Moore Oklahoma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- OCC Application, #2 Exhibit 2- 60% Plan, #3 Exhibit 3- BNSF MTD, #4 Exhibit 4- City of Moore Response to BNSF MTD, #5 Exhibit 5- OCC Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6- BNSF Exceptions to Decision of ALJ, #7 Exhibit 7- BNSF Motion for Oral Argument, #8 Exhibit 8- City of Moore Response to Exceptions, #9 Exhibit 9- Order Denying Motion for Oral Argument)(Burch, Derek)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Derek K Burch on behalf of City of Moore Oklahoma (Burch, Derek)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Deric J McClellan on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (McClellan, Deric)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John M Thompson on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Thompson, John)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by BNSF Railway Company . (Hall, Adam)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Adam C Hall on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Hall, Adam)
July 24, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3199228. (Hall, Adam)
July 24, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (knt)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Moore Oklahoma. (knt)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Moore Oklahoma filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Initial Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Appraisal Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company v. City of Moore Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Deric J McClellan
Represented By: Adam C Hall
Represented By: John M Thompson
Represented By: Malcolm E Rosser, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Moore Oklahoma
Represented By: Derek K Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?