Insight Investments LLC v. North American Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Insight Investments LLC
Defendant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00788
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before October 13, 2020. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 09/29/2020. (jb)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Insight Investments LLC. (Hathaway, P)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Chris M Warzecha on behalf of Insight Investments LLC (Warzecha, Chris)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by P Scott Hathaway on behalf of Insight Investments LLC (Hathaway, P)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Counsel are ORDERED to enter their appearances within seven days of this order. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 09/09/2020. (jb)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by North American Specialty Insurance Company . (Magrini, Robert)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Partial by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Magrini, Robert)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher D Skelton on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company (Skelton, Christopher)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert L Magrini on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company (Magrini, Robert)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Insight Investments LLC . (Hathaway, P)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Insight Investments LLC. North American Specialty Insurance Company served on 8/17/2020. (Hathaway, P)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to North American Specialty Insurance Company. (rb)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from Insight Investments LLC in the amount of $400.00, receipt number AOKWDC-3219831 regarding #1 Complaint (rb)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North American Specialty Insurance Company filed by Insight Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Insight Investments LLC v. North American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Represented By: Christopher D Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Insight Investments LLC
Represented By: P Scott Hathaway
Represented By: Chris M Warzecha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?