Khuen v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Karen Dana Khuen
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv00798
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Order to Waive Requirement of Association of Local Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/7/20. (lb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Order To Waive Requirement of Association of Local Counsel by Karen Dana Khuen. (Parmele, Daniel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (lb)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 8/13/20. (lb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel A Parmele on behalf of Karen Dana Khuen (Parmele, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Karen Dana Khuen. (dtb)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration filed by Karen Dana Khuen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khuen v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Dana Khuen
Represented By: Daniel A Parmele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?