Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155 et al v. New Prime Inc et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155
Defendant: New Prime Inc doing business as Prime Inc and Covenant Transport Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00810
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155 (Maloof, David)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Kipp C Leland on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155. (kmt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by David Thomas Maloof on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155 (Maloof, David)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David T. Maloof, granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kipp C. Leland, provided that said attys submit ECF registrations forms & file entries of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4 within 10 days of this date. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 8/18/2020. (llg)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155. Plf, as the party invoking diversity jurisdiction, is DIRECTED to file an amended complaint which provides the identification of the form of business entity for each of the underwriters and the jurisdictional information required for that business entity (as fully set out in this order). Said amended complaint shall be filed no later than 21 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 8/18/2020. (llg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Receipt for Money Received from Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155 in the amount of $100, receipt number OKW500081480 regarding #7 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kipp C. LeLand, #6 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David T. Maloof (kah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kipp C. LeLand by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Bryan, Daniel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David T. Maloof by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Bryan, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155 . (Bryan, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel E Bryan, III on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155 (Bryan, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155 in the amount of $400, receipt number OKW500081450 regarding #1 Complaint (dtb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Covenant Transport Inc, New Prime Inc. (dtb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Covenant Transport Inc, New Prime Inc filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155 et al v. New Prime Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Prime Inc doing business as Prime Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0507CG1800155
Represented By: Daniel E Bryan, III
Represented By: David Thomas Maloof
Represented By: Kipp C Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?