Original Investments LLC v. State of Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Original Investments LLC a Washington limited liability company doing business as Danks Wonder Emporium
Defendant: State of Oklahoma, Colonel Lance Frye, Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority, Oklahoma State Department of Health and Dr Kelly Williams
Case Number: 5:2020cv00820
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER (as fully set out in this order). Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/7/2020. (llg)
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary P West on behalf of All Defendants (West, Zachary)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Original Investments LLC. (Hickey, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2020 09:00 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 10/5/2020. (llg)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Yates, Randall)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Randall J Yates on behalf of All Defendants (Yates, Randall)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Yates, Randall)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda M Lowe on behalf of Original Investments LLC (Lowe, Amanda)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Original Investments LLC. Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority served on 8/24/2020. (Hickey, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Original Investments LLC. Oklahoma State Department of Health served on 8/21/2020. (Hickey, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Original Investments LLC. Kelly Williams served on 8/21/2020. (Hickey, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Original Investments LLC. Lance Frye served on 8/21/2020. (Hickey, John)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Matthew S. Warner is admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the plf, provided that Mr. Warner submits an ECF registration form & files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 8/18/2020. (llg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry G Ball on behalf of Original Investments LLC (Ball, Larry)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN (incorrect attorney name, attorney will re-file)- ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda M Lowe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lowe, Amanda) (dtb).
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by J Kevin Hayes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hayes, J)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (Hickey, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew S. Warner Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3230806 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Hickey, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by John M Hickey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hickey, John)
August 18, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3230799. (Hickey, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (dtb)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Original Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Original Investments LLC v. State of Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Randall J Yates
Represented By: Zachary P West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Lance Frye
Represented By: Randall J Yates
Represented By: Zachary P West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority
Represented By: Randall J Yates
Represented By: Zachary P West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State Department of Health
Represented By: Randall J Yates
Represented By: Zachary P West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Kelly Williams
Represented By: Randall J Yates
Represented By: Zachary P West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Original Investments LLC a Washington limited liability company doing business as Danks Wonder Emporium
Represented By: J Kevin Hayes
Represented By: Larry G Ball
Represented By: John M Hickey
Represented By: Amanda M Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?