Wilson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: James Wilson
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv00835
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by James Wilson. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 9/2/2020. (Mitzner, Miles)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Miles L Mitzner on behalf of James Wilson (Mitzner, Miles)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cps)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Let the applicant proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 8/21/2020. (cps)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Wilson. (rb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration filed by James Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilson
Represented By: Miles L Mitzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?