O'Reilly v. Medtronic Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sandra O'Reilly
Defendant: ABC Corp, F&A Foundation LLC doing business as Reign Medical, John Doe, Medtronic Inc and Reign Medical
Case Number: 5:2020cv00840
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ~ The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to file a second amended complaint #10 . In light of the anticipated Second Amended Complaint, the Court STRIKES Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #9 as MOOT. Within 14 days of the filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Defendant may file a responsive pleading. Additionally, as Plaintiff's counsel, Thomas J. Steece, has not yet filed an Entry of Appearance in compliance with LCvR83.4, he shall do so on or before October 23, 2020. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 10/16/2020. (dwl)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ~ Granting #12 and #13 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sara K. Thompson and Brandon D. Cox are hereby admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case, provided each counsel submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 10/14/2020. (dwl)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brandon D. Cox Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3329872 by Medtronic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Wilson, Ryan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sara K. Thompson Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3329466 by Medtronic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Wilson, Ryan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Medtronic Inc. (Wilson, Ryan)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Cross-Motion for Leave of Court to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Sandra O'Reilly. (Steece, Thomas)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Medtronic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wilson, Ryan)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ~ re #5 Motion to Dismiss. The Court STRIKES Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as MOOT. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 9/14/2020. (dwl)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Medtronic Inc filed by Sandra O'Reilly.(Steece, Thomas)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (this relates to the Notice of Removal) filed by Sandra O'Reilly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Implant Data Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Dismissals)(Steece, Thomas)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Medtronic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wilson, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan S Wilson on behalf of Medtronic Inc (Wilson, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Medtronic Inc . (Wilson, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Medtronic Inc. (Wilson, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3238746. (Wilson, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2020-3557 filed by Medtronic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jason Ruege (signed with exhibits), #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Sheet as of 8.20.20, #3 Exhibit 3 - District Court Petition, #4 Exhibit 4. District Court Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Reilly v. Medtronic Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F&A Foundation LLC doing business as Reign Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Inc
Represented By: Ryan S Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reign Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra O'Reilly
Represented By: Thomas J Steece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?