Fox-Robertson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Vicki Fox-Robertson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv00844
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Zelbst, Clay)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Louis DeJoy - PMG - Washington DC - Proof of service)(Zelbst, Clay)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit William Barr, Atty General - USA)(Zelbst, Clay)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ruth Przybeck, General Counsel - Torts - USPS)(Zelbst, Clay)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ronald Stroman, Dep PMG - USPS - Washington DC)(Zelbst, Clay)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Process Clerk - US Atty - OKC)(Zelbst, Clay)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS - Tort Claims Administrator - OKC)(Zelbst, Clay)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Timothy J. Downing - US Atty - OK)(Zelbst, Clay)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michael Allison - PM - OKC - Green Card)(Zelbst, Clay)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to OKC Post Office Postmaster, U.S. Postal Service, Postmaster General, Deputy Postmaster General, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (em)
August 24, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3240559. (Zelbst, Clay)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Vicki Fox-Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox-Robertson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Fox-Robertson
Represented By: Clay R Zelbst
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: David L Butler
Represented By: Chandra L Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?