Moore v. Pharmacorr LLC et al
Plaintiff: Margaret M Moore and Meg Moore
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc and Pharmacorr LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00866
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Corizon Health Inc . (Grose, Justin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Pharmacorr LLC . (Grose, Justin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Corizon Health Inc, Pharmacorr LLC.(Grose, Justin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin P Grose on behalf of Corizon Health Inc, Pharmacorr LLC (Grose, Justin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel R Fulkerson on behalf of Corizon Health Inc, Pharmacorr LLC (Fulkerson, Samuel)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret M Moore. Corizon Health Inc served on 8/31/2020. (Leonard, Jana)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret M Moore. Pharmacorr LLC served on 8/31/2020. (Leonard, Jana)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Margaret M Moore (Haupt, Shannon)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Margaret M Moore (Leonard, Jana)
August 27, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3248645. (Leonard, Jana)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (rb)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Margaret M Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Pharmacorr LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M Moore
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meg Moore
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc
Represented By: Samuel R Fulkerson
Represented By: Justin P Grose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacorr LLC
Represented By: Samuel R Fulkerson
Represented By: Justin P Grose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?