Tarrant et al v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Terrel, Sidalee Tarrent, Nanikka Tarrant and John and Jane Doe
Defendant: The Town of Maysville, The Mayville Town Cousel, Arron Glass and Mathew Perry
Case Number: 5:2020cv00891
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by The Mayville Town Cousel, The Town of Maysville. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Morris v. Humphrey, #2 Exhibit 2 - Simpson v. Little, #3 Exhibit 3 - Brashear v. Tulsa Cty. Bd. of Cty. Comm'rs, #4 Exhibit 4 - Snow v. Bd. of Cty. Comm'rs of the Cty. of McClain)(Gooch, Ambre)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nanikka Tarrant, John and Jane Doe, Sidalee Tarrent, Kenneth Terrel. The Mayville Town Cousel served on 10/9/2020; The Town of Maysville served on 10/9/2020. (Spratt, Phillip)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by The Mayville Town Cousel, The Town of Maysville to the Court Regarding Purported Service on Defendants Perry and Glass (Gooch, Ambre)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ambre C Gooch on behalf of The Mayville Town Cousel, The Town of Maysville (Gooch, Ambre)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Receipt for Money Received from All Plaintiffs in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500082070 regarding #1 Complaint. (knt)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Phillip S Spratt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spratt, Phillip)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Arron Glass, Mathew Perry, The Town of Maysville. (dtb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarrant et al v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Maysville
Represented By: Ambre C Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mayville Town Cousel
Represented By: Ambre C Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arron Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Terrel
Represented By: Phillip S Spratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidalee Tarrent
Represented By: Phillip S Spratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanikka Tarrant
Represented By: Phillip S Spratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John and Jane Doe
Represented By: Phillip S Spratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?