Wilson v. American Strategic Insurance Corp
Plaintiff: Kathryn L Wilson
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Case Number: 5:2020cv00899
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Duncan, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D Duncan on behalf of All Defendants (Duncan, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ben D Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Ben)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER counsel for plaintiff is directed to file an entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 09/11/2020. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/08/2020. (lam)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to American Strategic Insurance Corp. (knt)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corp filed by Kathryn L Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. American Strategic Insurance Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Represented By: Michael D Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn L Wilson
Represented By: Ben D Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?